HI HB2285 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (H) The committee(s) on LMG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (H) The committee(s) on LMG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a management and financial audit of the services provided by Evercare and Ohana Health Plan to medicaid clients under the QUEST Expanded Access program. Requires the development of an equitable referral system for discharged patients to care home facilities and a methodology to determine the level of acuity of nursing facility residents to set fair and equitable reimbursement. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB2285 HD1)
Title
Audit; QUEST Expanded Access; Evercare; Ohana Health Plan
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (H) The committee(s) on LMG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 02-15-12 1:30PM in House conference room 423. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takai excused (2). | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 110-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ching, Pine; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 01-30-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to HUS, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |