HI HB2281 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Re-referred to EEP/WAL, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Re-referred to EEP/WAL, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Public Utilities Commission to convene community outreach workshops to aid electric utilities in the development and implementation of best practices regarding wildfires. Requires electric utilities to design and operate in compliance with a risk-based wildfire protection plan approved by the Public Utilities Commission. Shields electric utilities from civil liability for acts taken in accordance with a risk-based wildfire protection plan and failing to act in accordance with an item in the draft plan but removed by the Public Utilities Commission. Shields the State, Public Utilities Commission, and its agents from liability for actions taken in the performance of their duties with respect to risk-based wildfire protection plans.
Title
Relating To Public Utilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Darius Kila [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EEP/WAL, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2997 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - The committee(s) on CPC/JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2281&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2281_.HTM |