HI HB2279 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a forum on the Department of Health website where state-licensed care facilities may post vacancy information to facilitate the placement of individuals. Requires community-based foster family homes, adult foster homes, and adult day care centers to be licensed and to face penalties for intentionally operating without a license. (HB2279 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-02-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Caregivers
Case Managers ($)
Compensation
Department of Health Website
Online Forum
Vacancies for State-Licensed Facilities
Case Managers ($)
Compensation
Department of Health Website
Online Forum
Vacancies for State-Licensed Facilities