HI HB2275 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 026, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 026, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies definition of "distressed property consultant" and specifies that attorneys must be licensed by, and engaged in the practice of law in, the State of Hawaii in order to fall within the class of exceptions to the definition of "distressed property consultant".
Title
Mortgage Rescue Fraud Prevention; Distressed Property Consultant; Attorney Exception
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Act 026, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126). |
2014-04-25 | House | Act 026, on 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126). |
2014-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 501). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3333) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Solomon, Slom. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-28-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2854) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 97). |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Nakashima, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Wooley, Thielen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-20-14 1:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (4). |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 386-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Evans, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Creagan. |
2014-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-10-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Monday, 02-10-14. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2825 (Same As) 2014-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.