HI HB2267 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Automated Speed Enforcement Systems Program. Authorizes the state or counties to administer the Automated Speed Enforcement Systems Program. Requires fines collected beginning 1/1/2025 for violations on a county highway to be expended for the operation of the Automated Speed Enforcement Systems Program. Creates a new offense of noncompliance with the posted speed limit under the Automated Speed Enforcement System. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Highway Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-09-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2). |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 157-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-24. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-01-24 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2443 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Act 112, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
Subjects
Appropriation
Automated Speed Enforcement System
Automated Speed Enforcement Systems Program Special Fund
Department of Transportation
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Highway Safety
Automated Speed Enforcement System
Automated Speed Enforcement Systems Program Special Fund
Department of Transportation
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Highway Safety