HI HB2255 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies powers of physician assistants regarding nurses under chapter regulating physicians. Removes sunset date of Act 255, SLH 2012.
Title
Physician Assistants; Nurses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-12-16 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-16 at 11:30AM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 at11:30AM in room 329. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-03-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2676 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2255&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2255_.HTM |