HI HB2252 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (H) The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (H) The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that violations for speeding in construction areas are only applicable when construction is actively occurring in the construction area.
Title
Traffic Safety; Speeding; Construction Zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | (H) The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-06-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2252 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2252_.HTM |