HI HB2244 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reactivates the individual development account contribution income tax credit for the five-year period from 2021 through 2025. Amends provisions regarding state-funded individual development accounts. Appropriates funds to the department of human services.
Title
Relating To Individual Development Accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 02-07-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2222 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2244&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2244_.HTM |