HI HB224 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a special account within the Hawaii Historic Preservation Special Fund and requires that archaeological permit fees collected be deposited into the account to cover the costs of managing the permits. Directs the Department of Land and Natural Resources to increase permit fees over time. (HB224 HD1)
Title
Historic Preservation; Archaeological Activity; Permits; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 02-14-11 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 195) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-02-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HAW, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |