HI HB2238 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to TRN, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to TRN, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a government agency does not assume ownership or jurisdiction over a disputed road solely through maintenance or repair activities. Authorizes the State to transfer ownership of roads in favor of counties by quitclaim if requested by the county.
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2366 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2238&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2238_.HTM |