HI HB2238 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits manufacturer recovery of increased warranty reimbursement to dealers. Effective July 1, 3000. (HB2238 HD1)
Title
Motor Vehicles; Reimbursement for Parts
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. George Fontaine [R] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 150). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Carroll, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-27-12 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 35 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |