HI HB2237 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Health to support the revision of the State Integrated Solid Waste Management Plan, based on the goal of achieving zero waste. (HB2237 HD2)
Title
State Integrated Solid Waste Management Plan; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPH/EET, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 272). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 884-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite. |
2016-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 441-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-11-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |