HI HB2237 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the ethanol facility income tax credit to include other liquid biofuels and to enable larger facilities to be eligible for the tax incentive.
Title
Biofuel Facilities; Income Tax; Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 269-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Cabanilla, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Chong, Herkes, Luke, Sagum. | |
2010-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-10 9:30am in conference room 325. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-09-10. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-10 9:00 am in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |