HI HB2236 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the current renewable energy technology systems tax credit with tax credits for solar energy property, wind energy property, and energy storage property. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2016.
Title
Renewable Energy; Solar and Wind Energy Property; Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-04-16 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-16. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-02-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2236&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2236_.HTM |