HI HB2226 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a baseline environmental study of the Keauhou bay area and establishes a moratorium on the issuance of new commercial vessel permits in the area.
Title
Keauhou Bay; Ocean Recreation Management Area; Baseline Environmental Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 02-07-14 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2226&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2226_.HTM |