HI HB2220 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to increase the State's capacity to train new nurses and project future nursing workforce needs. Provides that the nursing program at the University of Hawaii, West Oahu be reinstated as a condition to the appropriation. Effective 7/1/2055. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HRE/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3378) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HRE/HTH, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 193). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Branco. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 334-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-09 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-09-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3352 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to HTH/HRE, WAM.