HI HB2216 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Dependent Care Flexible Spending Accounts for all working taxpayers. Defines qualifying individuals and eligible expenses. Outlines the requirements and limitations of the accounts. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2022
Title
Relating To Dependent Care Flexible Spending Accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2216&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2216_.HTM |