HI HB2216 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on LAB/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on LAB/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a separate bargaining unit for employees of the HHSC. Authorizes HHSC to withhold or alter the benefits packages of certain employees.
Title
Collective Bargaining; Hawaii Health Systems Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on LAB/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-11 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Ichiyama, Takayama, Ing, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane. |
2014-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/HLT on Tuesday, 02-11-14 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-02-04 | House | Re-referred to LAB/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 15 |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2216&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2216_.HTM |