HI HB2206 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a motor vehicle dealer or salesperson license may be suspended, revoked, or denied if the dealer or salesperson withholds the return of a buyer's downpayment or trade-in when the buyer's motor vehicle purchase or lease agreement is contingent upon financing of the purchase, and pursuant to the financing or credit application signed at the time of purchase, the buyer was unable to qualify.
Title
Relating To Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2269 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Conditional Financing
Denial of Issuance or Renewal
Failure to Return
Motor Vehicle Dealer Licenses
Motor Vehicle Salesperson Licenses
Revocation
Suspension
Denial of Issuance or Renewal
Failure to Return
Motor Vehicle Dealer Licenses
Motor Vehicle Salesperson Licenses
Revocation
Suspension
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2206&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2206_.HTM |