HI SB2269 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a motor vehicle dealer or salesperson license may be suspended, revoked, or denied if the dealer or salesperson withholds the return of a buyer's downpayment or trade-in when the buyer's motor vehicle purchase or lease agreement is contingent upon financing of the purchase, and pursuant to the financing or credit application signed at the time of purchase, the buyer was unable to qualify.
Title
Relating To Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2206 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Conditional Financing
Denial of Issuance or Renewal
Failure to Return
Motor Vehicle Dealer Licenses
Motor Vehicle Salesperson Licenses
Revocation
Suspension
Denial of Issuance or Renewal
Failure to Return
Motor Vehicle Dealer Licenses
Motor Vehicle Salesperson Licenses
Revocation
Suspension
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2269&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2269_.HTM |