HI HB2204 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 087, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 087, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals annual increment and longevity step salary increases for department of education teachers and educational officers and clarifies that such increases shall be determined through collective bargaining. (SD1)
Title
Department of Education; Teachers; Educational Officers; Salary Increases; Longevity Step Increases
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Act 087, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188). |
2016-06-22 | House | Act 087, on 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188). |
2016-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 668). |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-28 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 662). |
2016-04-27 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Takumi, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Keith-Agaran, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 577) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3483) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2971) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, JDL/WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 120). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 817-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-16 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2016-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2016-02-05 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 39-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2622 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM.