HI HB220 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB220

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 06-23-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for operating expenses of the department of health. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 06-23-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2020-06-22SenateReceived notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
2020-06-22SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 366).
2020-06-22SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 365).
2020-06-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 536).
2020-06-22HouseHouse Conferees Added: Representative Aquino added as Co-Chair.
2020-06-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Fevella.
2020-06-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Mizuno, Luke Co-Chairs; Ward.
2020-06-22HouseRe-referred to TIA, HLT, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 48
2020-06-22HouseReceived notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
2020-06-19SenateSenate Conferee(s) discharged.
2020-06-19HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-17HouseRe-referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 54
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 706) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenateReported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1895) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kanuha, Riviere.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-28SenateRe-Referred to CPH/WAM.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 354).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from HLT/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 935) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-19HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Matsumoto.
2019-02-19HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/CPC on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HLT/CPC, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB548 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB220 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback