HI HB2187 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 8
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 8
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "gross rental proceeds" to provide that the transient accommodations tax for sales of transient accommodations that are arranged by transient accommodations brokers shall be calculated based on the amount charged by the transient accommodations broker, rather than the amount received by the operator of the transient accommodations.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2868 (Same As) 2018-07-11 - Act 211, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2187&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2187_.HTM |