HI HB2183 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Recommitted to JUD with none voting no and none excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Recommitted to JUD with none voting no and none excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of unlawful sale or trade of ivory products to prohibit any person, trust or estate, or business, firm, partnership, or other legal entity from importing, selling, offering to sell, or possessing with intent to sell any ivory product. Establishes a first violation as a misdemeanor and a second or subsequent violation as a class C felony. Effective January 1, 2015. (HB2183 HD1)
Title
Animal Welfare; Import and Sale of Ivory; Elephants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Recommitted to JUD with none voting no and none excused. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 826-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Wooley, McDermott. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 312-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-04 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Ito, Ohno. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-04-14 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2024 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPN, JDL/WAM.