HI HB2180 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits development in special management areas unless the development is first found to not be located in a sea level rise exposure area.
Title
Relating To Coastal Zone Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:15AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2180&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2180_.HTM |