HI HB2162 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends emergency management law to protect tenants, mortgagors, consumers, and residents for certain periods of time after the issuance of a gubernatorial or mayoral emergency proclamation. Classifies violations as unfair methods of competition and unfair and deceptive acts or practices.
Title
Relating To Emergency Management.
Sponsors
Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2904 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2162&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2162_.HTM |