HI HB2161 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the water resources research center at the University of Hawaii at Manoa to conduct a study on the impact of the increased safety standards for dams and reservoirs that were adopted by the department of land and natural resources. Requires a report to the legislature. Makes an appropriation. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB2161 HD1)
Title
UH; Dams; Reservoirs; Standards; Study; Report; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 97-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 01-31-14 9:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to WAL, HED, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |