HI HB216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Implements the recommendations of the working group convened pursuant to House Concurrent Resolution No. 90, Regular Session of 2016, by establishing and appropriating funds for a three-year community paramedic services pilot program. Requires a report to the Legislature before the Regular Session of 2021.
Title
Relating To Community Paramedic Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-02-17 at 8:30AM. |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-31-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB216 (Carry Over) 2017-02-02 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=216&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB216_.HTM |