HI HB2153 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of April of each year as the Hawaii Child Abuse Awareness and Prevention Month.
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 558-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2153&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2153_.HTM |