HI HB2147 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pre-arrest diversion pilot project for individuals with mental health or substance abuse challenges who allegedly commit nonviolent, nonfelony offenses on state property. Appropriates funds. (HB2147 HD2)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Lei Learmont [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 191). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 965-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Lowen, Todd, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 745-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 250-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-05 | House | Re-referred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS/PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |