HI HB2140 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects inconsistent terminology in statutory provisions relating to beneficiaries of retirement benefits dying prior to the death of the retirant.
Title
Relating To Retirement Allowance Options.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2236 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2140&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2140_.HTM |