HI HB2134 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a financial and management audit of the State Foundation on Culture and the Arts.
Title
Financial and Management Audit; State Foundation on Culture and the Arts
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3125 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Act 138, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1241).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2134&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2134_.HTM |