HI HB2128 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes housekeeping amendments to Hawaii's elections laws to clarify and improve the administration of elections by mail. Establishes a process, beginning on January 1, 2021, for preregistering or registering public school- and charter school-enrolled students to vote. Establishes ranked choice voting for special federal elections, special elections for vacant state senate or state house of representatives seats, and special elections for vacant county council seats. Amends filing deadlines for candidates attempting to fill vacant state senate seats. Effective 7/1/2030. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] |
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:05AM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 318). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Thielen, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1001-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-03-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
DOE
Elections
Ranked Choice Voting
State House of Representatives
State Public Charter School Commission
State Senate
Vacancies
Voter Preregistration or Registration
Voting by Mail
Elections
Ranked Choice Voting
State House of Representatives
State Public Charter School Commission
State Senate
Vacancies
Voter Preregistration or Registration
Voting by Mail