HI HB2117 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits the number of standardized tests students take in a school year. Requires the Board of Education to conduct a statewide survey of school administrators and teachers to determine the time spent on preparing for standardized tests and the impact of preparation time on the quality of instruction. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Standardized Testing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Woodson, Holt Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Ward.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 670) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3602) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2018-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2018-03-23SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3191) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2018-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2018-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 225.
2018-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 3:10PM in conference room 229.
2018-03-09SenateRe-Referred to EDU, WAM.
2018-03-06SenateReferred to EDU/LBR, WAM.
2018-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 187).
2018-03-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 937-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola.
2018-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
2018-02-15HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2018-02-12HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, McKelvey, Ohno, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
2018-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-12-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309.
2018-02-06HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3).
2018-02-06HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 77-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
2018-02-01HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2080 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback