HI HB2114 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Okamura excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Okamura excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a definition of consumer in the chapter on Health Insurance Exchange, requires statewide representation on the Health Insurance Exchange Board, clarifies that representation by providers is not limited to dental providers, and specifies that there shall be four consumers and three providers who serve on the Health Insurance Exchange Board. (HB2114 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Health Insurance Exchange; Health Insurance Exchange Board
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Okamura excused (1). | |
2012-02-02 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 49-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Mizuno, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ching; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Wooley. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-24-12 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |