HI HB2112 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of the lieutenant governor to convene a working group to examine the feasibility of establishing and implementing a kauhale pilot program based on specified criteria to provide shelter and other services to homeless individuals in the State and to submit a report of the working group's findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature prior to the regular session of 2021. Takes effect on December 31, 2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from HSH/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 394-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HSG on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2442 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.