HI HB2110 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits members of planned community associations to make electronic recordings of association meetings for personal use.
Title
Planned Community Associations
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 02-18-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Sagum, Wooley excused (3). | |
2010-02-01 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 21-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Chang, Coffman, Har, Herkes, C. Lee, Morita, Sagum; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Luke, Ching, Thielen. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 01-27-10 11:00am in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to HSG, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |