HI HB2109 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Re-referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - Re-referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that any person that violates: (1) section 183-17, HRS, (timber trespass in forest reserves) shall be guilty of a misdemeanor; or (2) a provision of part II of chapter 183, HRS, (forest reserves) or any rule adopted pursuant thereto, other than section 183-17, HRS, shall be guilty of a petty misdemeanor. Repeals the general penalty provision of chapter 183, HRS.
Title
Chapter 183; Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Re-referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2451 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 5:05pm in conference room 224.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2109&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2109_.HTM |