HI HB2108 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 037, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist Kaiuli Energy, LLC, with the financing of the planning, design, and construction of a seawater air conditioning district cooling facility and chilled water distribution system. Effective 6/29/2018. (HB2108 SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist A Seawater Air Conditioning Project In Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateAct 037, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
2018-06-13HouseAct 037, on 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
2018-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 706).
2018-05-03HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-05-03HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 702).
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 700).
2018-05-01HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18.
2018-05-01HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2018-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831).
2018-04-24SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Galuteria, Espero Co-Chairs.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Evans, Lowen Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 666) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3545) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani.
2018-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2018-03-23SenateReported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3140) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2018-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
2018-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 1:20PM in conference room 225.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to TRE, WAM.
2018-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 28).
2018-02-21HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-02-21HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-16HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakamura.
2018-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-13HouseReported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-07HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-02-07HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, McDermott.
2018-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:35AM in House conference room 309.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-19HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2715 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to EEP/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 35

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback