HI HB2105 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes exceptions to the offense of obstructing government operations and the offense of violation of privacy in the second degree for a person making a video or audio recording or photograph of a law enforcement officer while the officer is in the performance of duties in a public place or under circumstances in which the officer has no reasonable expectation of privacy; provided that the officer may take reasonable action to maintain safety and control, secure crime scenes and accident sites, protect the integrity and confidentiality of investigations, and protect the public safety and order. Establishes one-party consent exception for a person who intercepts a wire, oral, or electronic communication that involves a law enforcement officer when the person is not a party to the communication.
Title
Law Enforcement; Obstruction of Government Operations; Privacy in the Second Degree; One-party Consent; Electronic Communications; Video Recording; Audio Recording; Photograph
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2439 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Act 164, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2105&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2105_.HTM |