HI HB2090 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) on HAW recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - (H) The committee(s) on HAW recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fosters the development and growth of native Hawaiian-owned businesses. Provides 5% bid preference for native Hawaiian businesses certified by OHA. Requires immediate notification to OHA of ownership change and reapplication.
Title
Native Hawaiian Businesses Procurement Bid Incentive
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) on HAW recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-08-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to ERB, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2090 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2090_.HTM |