HI HB209 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 107, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 107, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state earned income tax credit. Changes income tax rates after 12/31/17. Repeals the sunset date for amendments made to the refundable food/excise tax credit by Act 223, SLH 2015. (HB209 CD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Act 107, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 107, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Oshiro, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Ito, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (6) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 121). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 121) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Johanson, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; English, Shimabukuro. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Johanson, Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584). |
2017-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 518) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1338) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-28-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 236). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 815) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |