HI HB2087 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electronic tracking of certain patients who are allowed outside a psychiatric facility. (HB2087 HD1)
Title
Relating To Mental Health Facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS/PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS/PBS on Tuesday, 02-13-18 9:05AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS/PBS, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |