HI HB2078 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and provides funding for the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation to participate in and contribute funding for the development of a Hawaii cyber ecosystem and related aspects of cybersecurity.
Title
Relating To Cybersecurity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 01-31-18 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2078&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2078_.HTM |