HI HB2078 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an excise tax equal to eighty-five per cent of the wholesale price of any tobacco product, other than large cigars, sold by a wholesaler or dealer on and after January 1, 2015, whether or not sold at wholesale, or if not sold then at the same rate upon the use by the wholesaler or dealer. Requires any increase in the excise tax rate imposed on cigarettes on or after 1/1/2015 to trigger an automatic excise tax increase on other tobacco products on or after 1/1/2015. Requires the additional moneys collected under the excise tax to be deposited to the credit of the Hawaii cancer research special fund.
Title
Tobacco Products; Excise Tax; Hawaii Cancer Research Special Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2078&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2078_.HTM |