HI HB2075 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 067, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1168).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 067, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1168).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation to provide fifty per cent matching grants to Hawaii awardees of alternative energy research grants from the United States Department of Defense, Office of Naval Research. Makes appropriations. (HB2075 CD1)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Act 067, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1168). |
2018-07-05 | House | Act 067, on 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1168). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 103-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 103-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Kidani, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, C. Lee, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-26-18 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria, Kidani Co-Chairs; L. Thielen. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, C. Lee, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 655) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3659) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 1:35PM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to ETT/TRE, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 307). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1043-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola. |
2018-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported from EDB/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 329-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/EEP on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EDB/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |