HI HB2069 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Recommitted to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Recommitted to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for the custody, inventory, and care of protocol gifts received by members of either house of the legislature or state employees. Effective 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Gifts.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Recommitted to JDC. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-22. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3627) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 308). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 948-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 644-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-16 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-16-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-16-22 at 9:30 AM. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-01 | House | Re-referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 5 |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3037 (Same As) 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.