HI HB2069 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Restricts asset forfeiture to cases involving the commission of a covered criminal misdemeanor or felony offense. Requires seized property to be forfeited only when the property owner has been convicted of an underlying covered criminal misdemeanor or felony offense. Changes the standard of proof that the State must meet in order for property to be forfeited from "preponderance of the evidence" to "beyond a reasonable doubt". Requires the State to prove that owners consented to or possessed knowledge of the crime that led to the seizure of their property. Requires that the agency seizing the property pay for safe and secure storage of the seized property until the completion of the forfeiture proceeding or final disposition of the property. Directs any proceeds from a civil forfeiture to the general revenue fund for public education purposes. Repeals administrative forfeiture proceedings. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Property Forfeiture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-03-16SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3419) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-17-20 2:17PM in conference room 211.
2020-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-03-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 314).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1000-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-13HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
2020-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-17HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback