HI HB2063 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Keahole Management Group LLC with planning, designing, constructing, and equipping facilities for the manufacturing and processing of products. (HB2063 HD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Keahole Management Group LLC ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 392-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-12-16 10:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |