HI HB2061 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a public charter school student who wishes to participate in a sport for which there is no athletic program at the student's charter school the ability to participate in a comparable program at any department school in the complex area where the student resides. Specifies that if the department school in the student's service area offers the student's desired athletic program, the student must participate in that athletic program and may not participate in an athletic program at a different department school in the same complex area.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2061&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2061_.HTM |